TN HB2797 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Failed in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Failed in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a brief summary of any question, regardless of length, submitted to the people for a vote. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Stewart [D] | Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Failed in Local Government Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2660 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee