TN HB2764 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a parent or guardian to notify their student's school if the student is adjudicated delinquent for any criminal offense involving a firearm, whether the offense was committed in this state or in another state. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 39 and Title 49, relative to notice to a school of a child's criminal offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2255 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee