TN HB2760 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from February 1 to February 15, the date by which the department of revenue must report findings and recommendations regarding sales taxes collected on electronic nicotine delivery devices to the speakers of the senate and the house of representatives and the chairs of the respective finance, ways and means committees. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, changes, from February 1 to February 15, the date by which the department of revenue must report findings and recommendations regarding sales taxes collected on electronic nicotine delivery devices to the speakers of the senate and the house of representatives and the chairs of the respective finance, ways and means committees. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-02 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2677 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-18 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.