TN HB2749 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines products made with hemp-derived cannabinoids that exceed 0.3 percent THC as marijuana; adds a mandatory $10,000 fine for offenses involving such products; adds testing, recordkeeping, and labeling requirements for licensees producing and selling hemp and hemp-derived cannabinoid products; prohibits sale of out-of-state hemp in this state. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 43, Chapter 27 and Chapter 423 of the Public Acts of 2023.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 43, Chapter 27 and Chapter 423 of the Public Acts of 2023, relative to cannabis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee- Government Operations for Review |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2749&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/HB2749.pdf |