TN HB2745 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits discrimination on the basis of a patient's COVID-19 vaccine status as it relates to organ transplants. - Amends TCA Title 14; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |