TN HB2738 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, lengthens the time a hotel operator in a home rule municipality that levies an occupancy tax is required to maintain tax records, from three years to four years. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 4; Title 13, Chapter 7, Part 6 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, lengthens the time a hotel operator in a home rule municipality that levies an occupancy tax is required to maintain tax records, from three years to four years. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 4; Title 13, Chapter 7, Part 6 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2477 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee