TN HB2719 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, encourages all employers in this state to provide a paid day off each Veterans' Day for all employees of the employer who are veterans. - Amends TCA Title 15 and Title 58.
Title
As introduced, encourages all employers in this state to provide a paid day off each Veterans' Day for all employees of the employer who are veterans. - Amends TCA Title 15 and Title 58.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. Curtis Halford [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Jason Hodges [D] |
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Sen. London Lamar [D] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-03-16 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2462 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee