TN HB2718 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes direct and continuing appropriations by airport authorities for the issuance of debt that is not a liability of the state and the payment of debt service thereon. - Amends TCA Title 9.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, to clarify the appropriation of funds to certain debt issuers for debt service payments. This act makes appropriations for debt service obligations for an indefinite period of time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2894 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee