TN HB2704 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-11 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes statutory language regarding expired requirement for quarterly status reports to the health committees of the general assembly concerning the implementation of a program of suspicion-based drug testing for applicants to TANF. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As introduced, deletes statutory language regarding expired requirement for quarterly status reports to the health committees of the general assembly concerning the implementation of a program of suspicion-based drug testing for applicants to TANF. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - HOUSE PUBLIC HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-09 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Public Health Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2592 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee