TN HB2702 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the information required to be provided in writing to foster parents by the department to include all information available to the department regarding the child's education status, mental health history and status, behavioral history, and physical disabilities. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, relative to foster care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Effective date(s) 04/29/2022 | |
2022-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 956 | |
2022-04-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-14 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2022-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor change. |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2741 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 956