TN HB2700 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Pub. Ch. 957
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Pub. Ch. 957
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a rebuttable presumption of substantial harm to a child if the child is not granted visitation with a grandparent who is the parent of the child's deceased parent. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, creates a rebuttable presumption of substantial harm to a child if the child is not granted visitation with a grandparent who is the parent of the child's deceased parent. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Pub. Ch. 957 | |
2010-06-07 | Effective date(s) 05/26/10 | |
2010-05-26 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-05-14 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-05-12 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-05-11 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-05-06 | Passed S., Ayes 25, Nays 2 | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 05/06/2010 | |
2010-04-29 | S. Reset on Cal. for 5/6/2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/29/2010 | |
2010-04-22 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/29/2010 | |
2010-04-22 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-03-31 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-03-29 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-03-29 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-29 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1163) | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/25/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Mtg. cancelled, Action def. in s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA to 3/16/10 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Action Def. in s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA to 3/9/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 02/23/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | Assigned to s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3036 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 957