TN HB2699 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pr. Ch. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pr. Ch. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, requires newly elected council members to receive certification from the MTAS Newly Elected Officials Class within 12 months of being elected; requires council members to receive any state-mandated certifications; changes how many absences by a council member that will result in a vacancy in the office; makes the council member's compensation contingent upon attendance at meetings. - Amends Chapter 128 of the Private Acts of 1990; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, requires newly elected council members to receive certification from the MTAS Newly Elected Officials Class within 12 months of being elected; requires council members to receive any state-mandated certifications; changes how many absences by a council member that will result in a vacancy in the office; makes the council member's compensation contingent upon attendance at meetings. - Amends Chapter 128 of the Private Acts of 1990; as amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Pr. Ch. 55 | |
2018-04-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-13 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-03-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2732 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 55