TN HB2689 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a civil action against any person or government entity that infringes upon a person's right to bear arms under the Tennessee or United States Constitutions; requires the person or entity to be liable for actual or statutory damages, punitive damages, attorney's fees, and court costs. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 54.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 54, relative to the Tennessee Firearms Freedom Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2516 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee