TN HB2689 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-06 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-06 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that the chief administrative officer of the highway department in Decatur County must have four years of experience in the use of highway construction equipment; withholds certain funds from Decatur County and reallocates such funds to counties subject to existing highway experience qualifications. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, provides that the chief administrative officer of the highway department in Decatur County must have four years of experience in the use of highway construction equipment; withholds certain funds from Decatur County and reallocates such funds to counties subject to existing highway experience qualifications. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | Withdrawn. | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee | |
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2729 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-25 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2689&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB2689.pdf |