TN HB2682 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 60 to 30 days the waiting period before a law enforcement officer who is a member of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system may be reemployed after the officer's effective date of retirement. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 8, relative to reemployment after retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-18 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0565) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-02 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 4, PNV 0 |
2024-04-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0703) |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2024-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2901 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-18 - Sponsor(s) Added.