TN HB2675 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-02 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires persons seeking a restaurant license to submit information regarding food sales to the commission in order to receive or renew a license to sell alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, requires persons seeking a restaurant license to submit information regarding food sales to the commission in order to receive or renew a license to sell alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Curry Todd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to last calendar | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-04-06 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Action Def. in s/c Local Government of S&LG to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2758 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-01 - Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2675&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2675.pdf |