TN HB2661 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022, 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022, 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions governing pharmacy benefits and pharmacy benefits managers. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 38; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5; Title 38; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71, relative to pharmacy benefits managers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/25/2022, 01/01/2023 | |
2022-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 1070 | |
2022-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0693) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0960) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0959) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 82, Nays 9, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0649) |
2022-04-27 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1013) |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2022-02-23 | House | Ref. to Insurance Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2458 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1070