TN HB2659 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Failed for Lack of Motion in: Commerce Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Failed for Lack of Motion in: Commerce Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts funeral merchandise from sales and use taxes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, exempts funeral merchandise from sales and use taxes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Failed for Lack of Motion in: Commerce Subcommittee | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 2/22/2012 | |
2012-02-08 | Action Def. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee to 2/22/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 2/8/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Assigned to s/c Commerce Subcommittee | |
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee--Finance | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2622 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2659&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB2659.pdf |