TN HB2658 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pr. Ch. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pr. Ch. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, designates the department of public works as the department of public works and public utilities; authorizes the mayor to exercise control over the divisions of the department. - Amends Chapter 568 of the Private Acts of 1939; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, designates the department of public works as the department of public works and public utilities; authorizes the mayor to exercise control over the divisions of the department. - Amends Chapter 568 of the Private Acts of 1939; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pr. Ch. 60 | |
2016-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-04-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-04-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2016-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/11/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2016 |
2016-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2016-03-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-03-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2683 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 60