TN HB2647 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a court from sentencing a defendant convicted of first degree murder to death if the defendant proves by a preponderance of the evidence that, at the time of the offense, the defendant had a severe mental illness. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a court from sentencing a defendant convicted of first degree murder to death if the defendant proves by a preponderance of the evidence that, at the time of the offense, the defendant had a severe mental illness. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2432 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee