TN HB2643 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes the blockchain and cryptocurrency study committee. - Amends TCA Title 45 and Title 47.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 45 and Title 47, relative to the blockchain and cryptocurrency study committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Action def. in Commerce Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2855 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee