TN HB2643 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-25)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 967
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-25)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 967
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates the public space constructed on top of the parking garage attached to the Cordell Hull Building as the "Beth Harwell Plaza"; designates the new tunnel that connects the Cordell Hull Building to the State Capitol as the "Ron Ramsey Tunnel". - Amends TCA Title 3.
Title
As enacted, designates the public space constructed on top of the parking garage attached to the Cordell Hull Building as the "Beth Harwell Plaza"; designates the new tunnel that connects the Cordell Hull Building to the State Capitol as the "Ron Ramsey Tunnel". - Amends TCA Title 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 967 | |
2018-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/15/2018 | |
2018-05-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-24 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 95, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB2643 |
2018-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-23 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA1137) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1136) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-11 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 99, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-11 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1176) |
2018-04-11 | House | All Ayes added as Sponsors |
2018-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Held on desk. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-26 | House | Sponsor change. |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2489 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 967