TN SB2489 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 967
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 967
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates the public space constructed on top of the parking garage attached to the Cordell Hull Building as the "Beth Harwell Plaza"; designates the new tunnel that connects the Cordell Hull Building to the State Capitol as the "Ron Ramsey Tunnel". - Amends TCA Title 3.
Title
As enacted, designates the public space constructed on top of the parking garage attached to the Cordell Hull Building as the "Beth Harwell Plaza"; designates the new tunnel that connects the Cordell Hull Building to the State Capitol as the "Ron Ramsey Tunnel". - Amends TCA Title 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 967 | |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Recalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2643 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 967