TN HB2642 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the use of campaign funds for the child care expenditures of a candidate that are incurred by the candidate as a direct result of the candidate's participation in campaign-related events and activities. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10 and Title 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 10 and Title 3, relative to campaign finances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-12 | House | No Action Taken |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/12/2022 |
2022-04-05 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/12/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Local Government Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2519 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee