TN HB2624 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Pr. Ch. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Pr. Ch. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes terms for mayor and aldermen from four years to two years. - Amends Chapter 133 of the Private Acts of 1994; as amended.
Title
As introduced, changes terms for mayor and aldermen from four years to two years. - Amends Chapter 133 of the Private Acts of 1994; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Pr. Ch. 29 | |
2016-03-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-03-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-08 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2648 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-08 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 29