TN HB2613 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires government entities to maintain records of information relating to the deaths of persons held in jails and prisons. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7 and Section 38-10-102.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7 and Section 38-10-102, relative to investigation reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective date(s) 04/20/2022 | |
2022-04-25 | Pub. Ch. 850 | |
2022-04-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-08 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0784) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 82, Nays 7, PNV 0 |
2022-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0691) |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2802 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 850