TN HB2586 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 787
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 787
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows applicants for retail food store wine license to seek certificate of compliance from local government and receive approval letter from commission prior to July 1, 2016; allows wholesalers to solicit orders from retail food stores and deliver wine prior to July 1, 2016; clarifies when retail package store may deliver to customers; limits retail package store licenses to two per owner. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-406 and Section 57-3-803.
Title
As enacted, allows applicants for retail food store wine license to seek certificate of compliance from local government and receive approval letter from commission prior to July 1, 2016; allows wholesalers to solicit orders from retail food stores and deliver wine prior to July 1, 2016; clarifies when retail package store may deliver to customers; limits retail package store licenses to two per owner. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-406 and Section 57-3-803.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 787 | |
2016-03-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-10 | House | Re-ref. Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2016 |
2016-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2094 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 787