TN HB2582 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the office of research and education accountability to study the research on optimal starting times for the school day for different grade levels and report its findings to the education committees of the senate and house of representatives by January 15, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires the office of research and education accountability to study the research on optimal starting times for the school day for different grade levels and report its findings to the education committees of the senate and house of representatives by January 15, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2608 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee