TN HB2570 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-7)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1019
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-7)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1019
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Rural Economic Opportunity Act of 2016"; authorizes a job tax credit for qualified business enterprises located in tier 4 enhancement counties; specifies the minimum jobs criteria and requirements to qualify for the credit; establishes the propelling rural economic progress (P.R.E.P.) fund; establishes guidelines for making grants from the P.R.E.P. fund. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Rural Economic Opportunity Act of 2016"; authorizes a job tax credit for qualified business enterprises located in tier 4 enhancement counties; specifies the minimum jobs criteria and requirements to qualify for the credit; establishes the propelling rural economic progress (P.R.E.P.) fund; establishes guidelines for making grants from the P.R.E.P. fund. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Pub. Ch. 1019 | |
2016-05-05 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2016 | |
2016-04-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-19 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-03-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2016 |
2016-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2538 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1019