TN HB2559 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 892
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 892
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the authorized operation times/days for drop-in centers from "not to exceed 14 hours per week and for not more than seven hours per day for any individual child during regular working hours" to "not to exceed 18 hours per week and for not more than nine hours per day during regular working hours." - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 3, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 3, Part 5, relative to child care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 892 | |
2022-03-31 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2723 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022