TN HB2557 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that on and after July 1, 2025, a minor child who is enrolled in TennCare or the CoverKids program remains eligible for TennCare or the CoverKids program until the minor child reaches six years of age; prohibits the bureau from subjecting the minor child to a redetermination of eligibility or disenrollment except under certain circumstances; requires the director to submit any necessary federal waiver request by December 31, 2024. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, relative to TennCare.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2125 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Failed in Senate Health and Welfare Committee / no second