TN HB2551 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state to provide employees compensation equivalent to at least $15.00 per hour. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 23; Title 9; Title 49; Title 50 and Title 54.
Title
As introduced, requires the state to provide employees compensation equivalent to at least $15.00 per hour. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 23; Title 9; Title 49; Title 50 and Title 54.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1797 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-27 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee