TN HB2544 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, rewrites the city charter. - Amends Chapter 49 of the Acts of 1891; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, rewrites the city charter. - Amends Chapter 49 of the Acts of 1891; as amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Local Government Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-04-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2642 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-07 - P2C held on desk. Local Bill
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2544&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB2544.pdf |