TN HB2536 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the department to establish by January 1, 2025, a publicly accessible website that contains information about the performance of child care agencies, including violations by the agency, injuries or deaths occurring at the agency, date of the agency's last inspection, and other relevant information. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37; Title 49 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36; Title 37; Title 49 and Title 71, relative to child care.
Sponsors
Rep. Aftyn Behn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2353 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-05 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee