TN HB2536 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that the written consent needed for the annexation of property primarily used for agricultural purposes be notarized. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 51 and Title 6, Chapter 58.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 6, Chapter 51 and Title 6, Chapter 58, relative to the change of municipal boundaries for farms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2022-04-12 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Local Government Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/12/2022 |
2022-04-05 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/12/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | No Action Taken |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2022-02-09 | House | Sponsor change. |
2022-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P1C. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro. |
2022-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2573 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-05 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee