TN HB2534 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the division of parks and recreation to designate one weekend per year, instead of one day per year, during which access to and use of all state parks is free of charge for veterans. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 3, Part 11; Title 16, Chapter 6; Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 13; Title 58; Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the division of parks and recreation to designate one weekend per year, instead of one day per year, during which access to and use of all state parks is free of charge for veterans. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 3, Part 11; Title 16, Chapter 6; Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 13; Title 58; Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1604 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee