TN HB2529 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds park model recreational vehicle as a type of recreational vehicle under the Tennessee Recreation Vehicle Franchise Act of 2016. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As introduced, adds park model recreational vehicle as a type of recreational vehicle under the Tennessee Recreation Vehicle Franchise Act of 2016. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1762 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2529&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HB2529.pdf |