TN HB2522 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1025
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1025
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the County Sheriff's Civil Service Law of 1974 in regard to political activities. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, revises the County Sheriff's Civil Service Law of 1974 in regard to political activities. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1025 | |
2010-05-20 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-05-19 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 5/20/10 | |
2010-05-19 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-05-12 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/18/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/12/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/12/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/05/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/5/2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-04-06 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-22 | Sponsor change. | |
2010-01-27 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3317 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 1025
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2522&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2522.pdf |