TN HB2521 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires new amendments or additions to political party rules to take effect 10 business days, instead of 10 days, after being filed with the secretary of state and the coordinator of elections. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, requires new amendments or additions to political party rules to take effect 10 business days, instead of 10 days, after being filed with the secretary of state and the coordinator of elections. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2654 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee