TN SB2654 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires new amendments or additions to political party rules to take effect 10 business days, instead of 10 days, after being filed with the secretary of state and the coordinator of elections. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, requires new amendments or additions to political party rules to take effect 10 business days, instead of 10 days, after being filed with the secretary of state and the coordinator of elections. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2521 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee