TN HB2519 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the chair of the state fair and exposition commission to serve three consecutive two-year terms, instead of only two consecutive two-year terms. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 57.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the chair of the state fair and exposition commission to serve three consecutive two-year terms, instead of only two consecutive two-year terms. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 57.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2386 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee