TN HB2518 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Pr. Ch. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Pr. Ch. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, transfers, effective July 1, 2014, the clerical duties for the probate court from the circuit court clerk to the clerk and master, and transfers all jurisdiction relating to probate matters from the general sessions court to the chancery court. - Amends Chapter 302 of the Private Acts of 1982.
Title
As introduced, transfers, effective July 1, 2014, the clerical duties for the probate court from the circuit court clerk to the clerk and master, and transfers all jurisdiction relating to probate matters from the general sessions court to the chancery court. - Amends Chapter 302 of the Private Acts of 1982.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Pr. Ch. 48 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-04-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2014-04-03 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/7/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/3/2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-17 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-03-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2615 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-22 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 48