TN HB2518 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires TBI to maintain a DNA database of certain juvenile sexual offenders and adds an adjudication of delinquency for an act which if committed as an adult would constitute aggravated rape of a child to the list of acts for which a court shall require a juvenile to submit a DNA sample. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, requires TBI to maintain a DNA database of certain juvenile sexual offenders and adds an adjudication of delinquency for an act which if committed as an adult would constitute aggravated rape of a child to the list of acts for which a court shall require a juvenile to submit a DNA sample. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Withdrawn. | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2622 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-02 - Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2518&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2518.pdf |