TN HB2507 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Pr. Ch. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-20 - Pr. Ch. 43
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, moves the election of mayor and city council to coincide with the regular November election beginning in 2014; increases salaries for mayor and council members effective after the 2014 and 2016 elections for such persons based on reelection dates; changes date and time of mayoral and city elections; revises provisions relating to petitions for recall, referendums and initiatives to coincide with general law. - Amends Chapter 327 of the Acts of 1903; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, moves the election of mayor and city council to coincide with the regular November election beginning in 2014; increases salaries for mayor and council members effective after the 2014 and 2016 elections for such persons based on reelection dates; changes date and time of mayoral and city elections; revises provisions relating to petitions for recall, referendums and initiatives to coincide with general law. - Amends Chapter 327 of the Acts of 1903; as amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Senate | Pr. Ch. 43 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1, Ayes 92, Nays 0 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | S. adopted am. #1 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-03-27 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-03-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-03-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2014-03-20 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-02-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2595 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-20 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 43