TN HB2505 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state insurance committee to extend eligibility for state insurance plans to any employee of a municipal government that is located in a municipality having a population of 300,000 or more, if the employee completes an opt-in process as established by the state insurance committee. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27.
Title
As introduced, requires the state insurance committee to extend eligibility for state insurance plans to any employee of a municipal government that is located in a municipality having a population of 300,000 or more, if the employee completes an opt-in process as established by the state insurance committee. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2299 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee