TN HB2503 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the court to include in any parenting plan involving shared custody of a child, the establishment of at least one designated location for the exchange of the child; provides that, unless otherwise agreed by both parents in writing, the court may require the parents to exchange the child at a neutral safe exchange location; requires each sheriff to designate at least one parking lot at the sheriff’s office as a neutral safe exchange location at which parents with shared custody of a child may meet to exchange the child. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 8 and Title 36.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 8 and Title 36, relative to child custody.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2437 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024