TN HB2497 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes insurers to offer individuals health insurance policies in Tennessee that have been approved for issuance in other states. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, authorizes insurers to offer individuals health insurance policies in Tennessee that have been approved for issuance in other states. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - HHR SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Health & Human Resources Committee (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Placed on s/c cal HHR Subcommittee for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-03-08 | Assigned to s/c HHR Subcommittee | |
2012-03-08 | Re-ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2012-01-18 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2012-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2634 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-28 - Action Def. in S. C,L&A to call of the Chair