TN HB2496 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 692
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 692
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows, under certain conditions, the advisory boards of the University of Tennessee institutions and state university boards to meet electronically or by other means of communication without a physical quorum present at the location of the meeting given in the meeting notice; changes from April 15 to May 31 the date by which the faculty member and the student member must be appointed to a University of Tennessee institution advisory board. - Amends TCA Section 8-44-108; Section 49-9-501 and Section 49-7-151.
Title
As enacted, allows, under certain conditions, the advisory boards of the University of Tennessee institutions and state university boards to meet electronically or by other means of communication without a physical quorum present at the location of the meeting given in the meeting notice; changes from April 15 to May 31 the date by which the faculty member and the student member must be appointed to a University of Tennessee institution advisory board. - Amends TCA Section 8-44-108; Section 49-9-501 and Section 49-7-151.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 692 | |
2020-06-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-05-29 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Higher Education Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2719 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 692