TN HB2489 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes required notice of proposed local sales tax to be published on local government's website in lieu of publication in newspaper of general circulation. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 7.
Title
As introduced, authorizes required notice of proposed local sales tax to be published on local government's website in lieu of publication in newspaper of general circulation. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 7.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2337 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee