TN HB2484 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-27 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, mandates private insurance coverage for treatment of pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections (PANDAS) and pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome (PANS). - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to pediatric medical disorders.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2401 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee